FL S0818 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision relating to compliance with maximum class size requirements for certain public schools of choice; revising requirements for charter school compliance with maximum class size requirements; revising requirements for district innovation school of technology compliance with maximum class size requirements; calculating a school district's class size categorical allocation reduction at the school average when maximum class size requirements are not met, etc.
Title
Maximum Class Size
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/15 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/04/15, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0665 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |