FL S0816 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an annual sales tax holiday for veterans; specifying items that are eligible for the sales tax holiday; requiring veterans to show proof of military status at the time of purchasing eligible items, etc.
Title
Annual Sales Tax Holiday for Veterans of the United States Armed Forces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H69 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/816 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/816/BillText/Filed/HTML |