FL S0814 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that all school buses be equipped with air-conditioning systems that meet certain specifications beginning in a specified school year, etc.
Title
Air-conditioning Systems in School Buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/814 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/814/BillText/Filed/HTML |