FL S0812 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing minors who have certain felony arrests to have the Department of Law Enforcement expunge their nonjudicial arrest record upon successful completion of a prearrest or postarrest diversion program; revising the information that must be provided in the written statement from the state attorney or statewide prosecutor in order for a person to be eligible for a criminal history record expunction; revising when a certificate of eligibility for expunction shall be issued, etc.
Title
Expunction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |