FL S0808 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129), CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129), CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the information in the reports required to be submitted to the Florida State Boxing Commission by a promoter or obtained by the commission through audit of a promoter's records; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Florida State Boxing Commission
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Bill Galvano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129), CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 775 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/14 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0810 (Related) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128), CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129)
H0775 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128)
H0773 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-128, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129)
H0775 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128)
H0773 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-128, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129)