FL S0806 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the sale for human use of diapers, incontinence undergarments, incontinence pads, or incontinence liners from the sales and use tax, etc.
Title
Tax Exemption for Diapers and Incontinence Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |