FL S0806 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the governing board of a local government to consider estimated costs of certain projects using generally accepted cost-accounting principles that account for specified costs when making a specified determination; requiring that a local government that performs projects using its own services, employees, and equipment disclose the actual costs of the project after completion to the Auditor General; requiring estimated total construction project costs for certain projects to include specified costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Public Construction Works

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H167 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25520Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33641Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback