FL S0806 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Committee on Early Grade Success within the Department of Education; specifying committee purpose; requiring the University of Florida Lastinger Center for Learning to provide necessary staff for the committee, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committee on Early Grade Success

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Education
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations; Rules
2017-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1229 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback