FL S0806 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 585 (Ch. 2016-227)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring school districts to provide instruction to homebound or hospitalized students; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt rules related to student eligibility, methods of providing instruction to homebound or hospitalized students, and the initiation of services; requiring each school district to enter into an agreement with certain hospitals within its district by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instruction for Homebound and Hospitalized Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 585 (Ch. 2016-227)
2016-03-10SenateSubstituted HB 585
2016-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/16
2016-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2016-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-01-28SenateNow in Appropriations
2016-01-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2016-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/28/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2016-01-21SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2016-01-20SenateFavorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2016-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/20/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-11-19SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-11-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0585 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-227

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100357Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback