FL S0806 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the clerk of the value adjustment board to have available and distribute specified forms; authorizing the owner of multiple items of tangible personal property to file a joint petition with the value adjustment board under certain circumstances; requiring the property appraiser to include the property record card in an evidence list for a value adjustment board hearing under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Value Adjustment Board Proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Appropriations
2014-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2014-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2014-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 03/19/14, 5:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2014-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2014-03-05SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2014-02-06SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2014-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0651 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
194011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback