FL S0806 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a district school board to set an opening date for schools in the district to accommodate the completion of student coursework and assessments during the fall term; providing additional purposes for which an internal auditor may be employed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers and Duties of District School Boards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Education
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-19SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2013-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0127 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H0657 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback