FL S0806 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Citrus County to apply to the Department of Economic Opportunity for designation of an enterprise zone; providing an application deadline and requirements; authorizing the department to designate an enterprise zone in Citrus County; requiring the department to establish the effective date of the enterprise zone, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
2012-02-24 Now in Budget -SJ 682
2012-02-23 Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 682
2012-02-20 On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2012-01-31 Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2012-01-31 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 303
2012-01-30 Now in Budget -SJ 300
2012-01-30 Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 300
2012-01-25 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2012-01-19 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 252
2012-01-19 Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 252
2012-01-13 On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 68
2011-12-05 Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 68
2011-11-02 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29000729Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback