FL S0796 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing eligibility criteria for high-impact school operators; requiring that high-impact schools be funded through the Florida Education Finance Program; establishing the High-impact Schools Revolving Loan Program, etc.
Title
K-12 Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 5 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/17/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7101 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H5103 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5105 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5103 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5105 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |