FL S0794 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring parties to civil actions to provide copies of certain third-party agreements to the other parties, except when otherwise ordered by the court, etc.
Title
Third-party Agreements in Civil Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1059 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/794 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/794/BillText/Filed/HTML |