FL S0794 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits specified offenses within 1,000 feet of the real property comprising a homeless shelter. Defines the term "homeless shelter." Provides criminal penalties. Ranks offenses on the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-05 Now in Budget -SJ 322
2011-04-04 Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 322
2011-03-30 Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 300
2011-03-29 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-28 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 300
2011-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 62
2011-02-09 Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 62
2011-02-03 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0897 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback