FL S0790 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to require the Lieutenant Governor to serve as the Secretary of State, to specify the secretary's duties, and to authorize the Lieutenant Governor to cast tiebreaking votes on any measure on which the Senate is equally divided, etc.
Title
Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/790 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/790/BillText/Filed/HTML |