FL S0786 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a law enforcement officer to remove persons who trespass in a structure or conveyance or on property if the law enforcement officer receives an affidavit from an owner or mortgagee of the property.
Title
Landlord and Tenant
Sponsors
Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Miguel Diaz De La Portilla [R] | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 633 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Rules -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-24 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 62 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules -SJ 62 | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1089 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
810 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |