FL S0780 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2017-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2017-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "qualifying adoptive employee" to include persons employed by charter schools and the Florida Virtual School for the purpose of extending adoption benefits to those employees; authorizing such employees of charter schools and the Florida Virtual School to apply retroactively for the adoption benefit in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Adoption Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2017-140) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 749 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0749 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-140