FL S0780 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that an insured may not be required to obtain a prescription drug for the treatment of a chronic illness exclusively from a mail order pharmacy; prohibiting the imposition of copayments or conditions on an insured living with a chronic illness if such copayments or conditions are not imposed on an insured who uses a mail order pharmacy that meets certain requirements; requiring certain health insurers to disclose in the outline of coverage that an insured may obtain certain prescription drugs from a retail pharmacy, etc.
Title
Provision of Pharmaceutical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0583 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |