FL S0780 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative findings. Authorizes the payment of dues to The Florida Bar for certain attorneys employed by the state.
Title
Payment of Bar Dues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 61 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 62 | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/780 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0780/BillText/Filed/HTML |