FL S0778 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring applicants for a certificate of eligibility for expunction of certain criminal history records to pay a specified fee to the Department of Law Enforcement for placement in a specified trust fund, etc.
Title
Fees/Expunction of Certain Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S776 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H1473 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1473 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/778 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/778/BillText/Filed/HTML |