FL S0776 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 491
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Increasing the fine for the theft of a commercially farmed animal or a bee colony of a registered beekeeper, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.





2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 491
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted HB 491
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Agriculture
2018-01-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Agriculture; Rules

Same As/Similar To

H491 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments