FL S0774 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to provide specified records to entities conducting preliminary home studies; limiting certain training requirements to persons who adopt children from the department, etc.
Title
Dependency Proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H505 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |