FL S0774 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an independent commission on legislative apportionment and congressional redistricting; requiring the commission to conduct public hearings, and to receive information from residents of the state through specified means; providing that commission members and employees are subject to public records, public meetings, and specified financial disclosure requirements, etc.
Title
Legislative Apportionment and Congressional Redistricting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0041 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/774 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0774/BillText/Filed/HTML |