FL S0768 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the awarding of attorney fees for a violation of specified provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-04-03SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H297 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7840485Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback