FL S0768 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the act as the "Marine Product Manufacturers and Dealers Act"; providing for the application of the act to agreements between a dealer and a manufacturer, distributor, or wholesaler of marine products; providing requirements for warranty agreements and the processing of warranty claims relating to marine products; requiring that a dealer in marine products provide predelivery and preparation obligations; requiring that a manufacturer, distributor, or wholesaler indemnify a dealer of marine products for losses relating to legal actions; providing that the act does not preempt local ordinances unless the ordinances are inconsistent with the act, etc.
Title
Commercial Relationships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Commerce and Tourism | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 65 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 65 | |
2011-10-31 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/768 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0768/BillText/Filed/HTML |