FL S0766 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Commission on Ethics to create the Local Government Lobbyist Registration System; prohibiting a person from lobbying a governmental entity absent registration with the commission; requiring the commission to publish a lobbyist directory; requiring boards of county commissioners and governing bodies of municipalities, respectively, to provide notice of certain meetings in a specified manner, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Accountability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-11-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S768 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H611 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1123148Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback