FL S0766 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands a public records exemption for specified personal information of the spouses and children of active and former law enforcement and investigatory personnel. Expands a public records exemption for specified personal information of firefighters and for their spouses and children. Provides for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions under the Open Government Sunset Review Act. Provides a statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Law Enforcement/Firefighters
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 61 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules -SJ 61 | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1027 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/766 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0766/BillText/Filed/HTML |