FL S0764 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7023
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain courts to create and administer veterans treatment courts for specified purposes; providing standards for admission to a veterans treatment court program; specifying eligibility requirements for participation in the program; revising eligibility for certain pretrial programs to include certain individuals eligible to participate in a veterans treatment court program; specifying applicability of the act to participants in certain court programs in existence as of a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Treatment Courts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7023
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7023
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-19SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-25SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2021-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-23SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-18SenateCS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
2021-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-18SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2021-03-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-16SenateCS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7023 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39447891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
910035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94821Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Amendment/952314/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Amendment/112316/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Analyses/2021s00764.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Vote/2021-03-16%200330PM~S00764%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Vote/2021-03-23%201230PM~S00764%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/764/Vote/2021-04-19%201000AM~S00764%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback