FL S0762 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to a cap-and-trade regulatory program to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from electric utilities. Conforms a cross-reference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Climate Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-03 In Messages
2011-05-03 Read 3rd time -SJ 725
2011-05-02 Read 2nd time -SJ 632
2011-04-29 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11
2011-04-27 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 540
2011-04-13 Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 468
2011-04-08 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 473
2011-03-18 Now in Budget -SJ 235
2011-03-17 Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 -SJ 235
2011-03-14 On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/17/11, 1:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 60
2011-03-07 Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -SJ 117
2011-02-28 On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/07/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-02-09 Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 60
2011-02-02 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H4117 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3668255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback