FL S0760 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a municipality or special fire control district that provides fire protection services to a municipal services taxing unit under an interlocal agreement to receive property insurance premium taxes; authorizing a county on behalf of a municipal services taxing unit that enters into an interlocal agreement for fire protection services with a municipality to assess and impose an excise tax on property insurance premiums; providing that an independent special fire control district has, and that the board of such district may exercise by majority vote, specified powers, etc.
Title
Intergovernmental Programs
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
175 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
191 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |