FL S0760 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing additional circumstances in which an out-of-country foreign judgment need not be recognized, etc.
Title
Grounds for Nonrecognition of Out-of-country Foreign Judgments
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 623 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substituted HB 623 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H623 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-37
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/760 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/760/BillText/Filed/HTML |