FL S0760 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Joint Committee on the Library of Congress to approve the replacement of the statue of Confederate General Edmund Kirby Smith in the National Statuary Hall with a statue of Marjory Stoneman Douglas, etc.
Title
National Statuary Hall
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0507 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/760 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0760/BillText/Filed/HTML |