FL S0750 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 10:00 am in 110 Senate Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting an agency that receives a request to inspect or copy a record from responding to such request by filing a civil action against the individual or entity making the request, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H273 (Same As) 2018-01-11 - Placed on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback