FL S0750 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Protect Florida Small Business Act"; prohibiting a franchisor from terminating or not renewing a franchise except under certain circumstances; prohibiting a franchisor from denying certain persons the opportunity to participate in the ownership of a franchise for a specified period after the death of the franchisee or the person controlling a majority interest; providing that a franchisee must have the opportunity to monetize certain equity from the franchise business under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Franchises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/04/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1069 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
686 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |