FL S0748 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1197 (Ch. 2021-230)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1197 (Ch. 2021-230)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the requirement that the Clerk of the Supreme Court physically keep books, records, and other materials in the clerk's office; requiring the clerks of the circuit court to collaborate with specified entities to prepare a plan to procure or develop a statewide electronic solution to accurately identify all assessments mandated by statute; providing for the periodic inflationary adjustment of the monetary jurisdictional limit applicable to all actions at law in county courts filed on or after a specified date, beginning in a specified year; requiring the clerk of a district court of appeal to have an office at the headquarters of the court, etc.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1197 (Ch. 2021-230) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1197 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/24/21, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/02/21, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1197 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-230
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2457 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |