FL S0748 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing limitations regarding the use of state funds for the administration of the hall of fame and for the reimbursement of travel expenses for members of the Florida Veterans' Hall of Fame Council, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Veterans' Hall of Fame

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-10SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6049 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
265003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback