FL S0748 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the use of a copy, facsimile transmission, or other reliable reproduction of an original proxy vote for certain purposes; revising liability of unit owners under certain conditions; authorizing condominium associations and cooperative associations to conduct votes of the membership by online voting under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Residential Properties
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 791 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0791 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-97
S0348 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
H1211 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
S0348 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
H1211 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 791 (Ch. 2015-97)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |