FL S0748 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the factors to be considered for alimony awards, including adultery; providing that if the court orders a party to provide security to protect an award of alimony, the court may so order only upon a showing of special circumstances; prohibiting a court from reserving jurisdiction to reinstate an alimony award if a supportive relationship ends; prohibiting the court from granting a final dissolution of marriage with a reservation of jurisdiction during the first 180 days after the date of service of the original petition for dissolution of marriage to subsequently determine all other substantive issues except in exceptional circumstances, etc.
Title
Dissolution of Marriage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Rules | |
2012-03-06 | Now in Rules -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-13 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time -SJ 503 | |
2012-02-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 63 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Judiciary; Budget; Rules -SJ 63 | |
2011-10-28 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |