FL S0746 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 529
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 529
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that doorstep refuse and recycling collection containers be allowed in exit corridors of certain apartment occupancies under certain circumstances; authorizing authorities having jurisdiction to approve certain alternative containers and storage arrangements, etc.
Title
Florida Fire Prevention Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 529 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 529 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H529 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-152