FL S0736 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that school districts that provide basic training in first aid teach students the psychomotor skills associated with performing cardiopulmonary resuscitation at least one time before graduation from high school; providing a definition for the term "psychomotor skills," etc.
Title
Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Training in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 62 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 62 | |
2011-10-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/736 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0736/BillText/Filed/HTML |