FL S0734 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the authority of the State Health Officer to order the vaccination of individuals upon declaration of a public health emergency; revising a requirement that the Department of Health adopt certain rules, etc.
Title
Vaccinations During Public Health Emergencies
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6009 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
H6069 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
H6069 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/734 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/734/BillText/Filed/HTML |