FL S0730 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying which health plan entities are subject to the subscriber assistance program; authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to extend or modify certain contracts with behavioral health care providers under specified circumstances; directing the agency to calculate a medical loss ratio for managed care plans under specified circumstances and providing the method of calculation; specifying that contracts necessary to administer the Medicaid program are not rules and are not subject to ch. 120, F.S., the Administrative Procedure Act, etc.
Title
Medicaid Managed Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#63 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1167 (Y: 82 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1137 (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1167 (Y: 82 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1137 (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1134 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 82 NAYS 37 -HJ 1243 | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1088 | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (238196, 401736) -SJ 1083 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 35 -HJ 1165 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1164 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1129 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1102 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1102 | |
2012-03-01 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 715 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 715 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -SJ 695 | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Budget -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 01/24/12, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Budget -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-20 | CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 256 | |
2012-01-20 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/12, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 62 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 62 | |
2011-10-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
408 | 7056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 984 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |