FL S0728 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising safety requirements for liveries and requiring hands-on instruction that meets specified requirements; providing an exemption from certain safety requirements when a renter hires a professional captain; revising insurance requirements for liveries and renters, etc.
Title
Liveries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-03-28 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H261 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules