FL S0728 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation may authorize advance deposit wagering conducted by certain permitholders or certain operators contracting with a permitholder; specifying requirements, prohibitions, and authorizations for a person authorized to conduct advance deposit wagering; prohibiting a resident or other individual from placing a wager through an advance deposit wagering system under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Advance Deposit Wagering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/728 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0728/BillText/Filed/HTML |