FL S0728 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 758
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 758
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of employer payroll service providers who qualify for access to unemployment tax information by filing a memorandum of understanding. Revises provisions relating to statutory construction. Requires that an individual claiming benefits report certain information and participate in an initial skills review. Disqualifies an individual for benefits for any week he or she is incarcerated. Requires claims to be submitted by electronic means, etc.
Title
Unemployment Compensation
Sponsors
Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Senate Judiciary Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 758 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 672 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendments adopted-Temporarily postponed | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-11 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-09 | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 59 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-25 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-02-22 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/22/11, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 59 | |
2011-01-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7005 () 2011-05-06 - In returning messages
S1058 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1728 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1058 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1728 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |