FL S0726 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the schooner Western Union as the official state flagship.
Title
State Symbols/Official State Flagship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 597 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Now in Environmental Preservation and Conservation -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/30/11, 3:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 59 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules -SJ 59 | |
2011-01-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0681 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration