FL S0722 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the minimum amount of the factor used to calculate the cost-of-living adjustment of benefits for certain retirees and beneficiaries of the Florida Retirement System, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H665 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback