FL S0716 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1223 (Ch. 2013-210)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1223 (Ch. 2013-210)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a civil penalty for a person who willfully uses a deceptive or unfair trade act or practice against a military service member or the member's spouse or child in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1223 (Ch. 2013-210) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1223 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (908522) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-19 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/13, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/07/13, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1223 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-210