FL S0714 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for confidential and proprietary business information and trade secrets received by the Department of Gaming Control; providing an exemption from public records requirements for information held that would reveal investigation techniques and procedures used by the Department of Gaming Control; providing an exception to the exemption for other governmental entities having oversight or regulatory or law enforcement authority; providing penalties for an employee of the department who violates the provisions of the act; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Department of Gaming Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time -SJ 106 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 61 | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/09/12, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 61 | |
2011-10-26 | Filed |